+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-15.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-15 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO.
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor