+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, EDN, referral sheet 42
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-16.
- Reported from EDU/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3253) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 12:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/WLA.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor