+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-16.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3344) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 10:15AM in conference room 229.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to CPH.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3199), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, CPH.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.