+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 476) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3225) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3083), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor