+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3710) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3333), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-28-18 2:50PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor