+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3826) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 07-06-20 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Offered.