+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Kouchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen, Slom).
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-13.
- Waived referral to WAM.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor