+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3110), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:40PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.