+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-16.
- Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3320) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Slom.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor