+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-12-19.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-23-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2221) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Taniguchi.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-19 10:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor