+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 719).
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1720), recommending adoption.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- Re-referred to HSG, referral sheet 57
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon, Slom.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/THA, WAM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor