+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3496) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3269), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR, WAM.
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor