+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-12-19.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 836).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2287), recommending adoption.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
- Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2255), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Friday, 04-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 617) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1834) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/AEN, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.