+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-30-15 1:40PM in conference room 224.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/HWN, WAM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor