+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3473) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3276), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 1:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/GVO, WAM.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.