+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3453) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3319), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.