+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 450).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor