+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1741) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.