+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from GVO/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/CPH, JDL/WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor