+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2050-18), recommending adoption.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 52
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-02-18.
- Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3344) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDC.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor