+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1769) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-07-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 528) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor