+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3281), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor