+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 742).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-29-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699-14), recommending adoption.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 308.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from EDU/PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3229) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Green.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-14 1:30PM in conference room 414.
- Re-Referred to EDU/PSM/WTL.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 1:05PM in conference room 225.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor