+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-13.
- Reported from HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/TEC.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.