+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1173), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/CPN, JDL.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor