+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HWN/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1202), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Harimoto.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/HSH, JDL.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.