+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 861).
- Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 861).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-27-21.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-21.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 599).
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1918), recommending adoption.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
- Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513) with recommendation of adoption.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:45PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor