+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 609) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/TEC, WAM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor