+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/ETT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3262), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/ETT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 3:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/ETT/GVO, WAM.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor