+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto).
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-21-20.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3591) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HRE is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 05-19-20 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 05-14-20 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received.