+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-21.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HRE is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 04-13-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
- Received.