+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto).
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-19-20.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3544) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPH is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 05-14-20 10:05AM in conference room 016.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 05-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received.