+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-21.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1821) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPN is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-09-21 9:20AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Received.