+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-14.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3480) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HRE is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received.