+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto).
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-21-20.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3588) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on TEC is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 05-19-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 05-15-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received.