+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 25. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-25-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3839) with recommendation to Consent.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on JDC is to CONSENT to the nomination. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Received.