+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 23. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Kidani).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-17-17.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on HRE is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-04-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
- Received.