+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Nominee Stefanie Jefts withdrawn by Governor. (Gov. Msg. No. 856)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 05-18-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 05-13-20 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-20 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN.
- Received.