+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 21. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Kouchi).
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-14-16.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2861) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on EET is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Ruderman.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET.
- Received.