+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Confirmed. Ayes, 24. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-06-17.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-17.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313) with recommendation to Advise and Consent.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on CPH is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ihara.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Received.