+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- This measure has been deferred.
- Nominee Rona M. Suzuki withdrawn by Governor. (Gov. Msg. No. 869)
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 07-10-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3809).
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The recommendation was not adopted.
- The recommendation of the committee(s) on WAM is to ADVISE AND CONSENT to the nomination(s). The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 6 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-06-20 1:00PM in conference room Auditorium.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-02-20 9:30AM in conference room Auditorium.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Received.