+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 775).
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day 05-02-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781), recommending adoption.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-29-13 9:05AM in conference room 308.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Takai, Cheape.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-18-13 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 414).
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-01-13.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 2:05PM in conference room Auditorium.
- Referred to EDU.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.