+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Nakashima, Tupola.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-16-15 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 49
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 453).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1390) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor