+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-10-13 9:45AM in conference room 229.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150), with recommendation of referral to CPN.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor