+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 728).
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750), recommending adoption.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, C. Lee, McDermott.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 52
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 437) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-03-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.