+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1819), recommending adoption.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1767), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Thielen.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-12-17 11:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 38
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 395) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-30-17.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor