+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-24-14.
- Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-24-14.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-23-14.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 700).
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Choy, McDermott, Wooley.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by EEP/VMI on Wednesday, 04-16-14 9:30AM in conference room 423.
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/VMI on Wednesday, 04-16-14 9:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP/VMI, referral sheet 54
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 460).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3201) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 04-01-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-31-14 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/HTH.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor