+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 626).
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Nakashima, Tokioka, Tupola excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1748-16), recommending adoption.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 04-14-16 10:55AM in conference room 325.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WAL, referral sheet 43
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-16.
- Reported from EET/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3254) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/WLA.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor