+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, PBS, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3376) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-05-16 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to PSM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2977), with recommendation of referral to PSM.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 1:25PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, PSM.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor