+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 749).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-25-13.
- Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-25-13.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-24-13.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 726).
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1715) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ward, Brower, Ohno.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 04-19-13 9:00AM in conference room 423.
- Re-referred to EDB, referral sheet 56
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1428) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 016.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:50PM in conference room 016.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor